U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03111
  • Case Name: Massey v. Harris et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 18, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 18, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.