U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quansah
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.