U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanfield
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.