U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01324-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.