U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01322-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mack
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.