U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hubbell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 17, 2022: [Witness List]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 08, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.