U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Restainto-Uhl
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.