U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02062
  • Case Name: Coleman v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.