U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02061
  • Case Name: Holloman v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.