U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02060
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Abukhalaf
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • August 05, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 31, 2022: [Stay]
  • March 31, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 31, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.