U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUTTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.