U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lineberry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 05, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.