U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01336-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Decker
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Docket Call]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.