U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beatty-Talbert
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.