U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03116
  • Case Name: Harris v. Ishee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.