U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mc-00005
  • Case Name: Fadlalla et al v. Dyncorp International LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 19, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • April 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 18, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 04, 2022: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.