U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Broadhurst
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: [Screening Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 22, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Service by Publication]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 15, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 04, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.