U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03117
  • Case Name: Taylor v. 4th Circuit Court of Appeals et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.