U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02065
  • Case Name: Bussie v. Leycock
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.