U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stewart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motions Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.