U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 14, 2022: [Witness List]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 08, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 05, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.