U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deloatch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.