U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02066
  • Case Name: Stephenson v. Buffaloe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 25, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • April 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 13, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.