U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03118
  • Case Name: Meader v. SHU Correctional Officers et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Interrogatories Propounded]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time-Other]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Declaration]
  • December 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 05, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 05, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 03, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Case Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.