U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AGNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • September 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Exam Report SEALED]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 07, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.