U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.