U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bullman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • November 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 20, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 05, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 18, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 13, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.