U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Icenhour
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 26, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 20, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.