U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crowder et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • October 04, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 15, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 13, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 08, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.