U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • May 09, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • May 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.