U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 06, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.