U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klingensmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.