U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clifton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.