U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03123
  • Case Name: Guidry v. Graddy et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.