U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Document]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.