U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03122
  • Case Name: Best v. Ezzell et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.