U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 17, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.