U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03119
  • Case Name: Farmer v. Gore
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice-other]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2022: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.