U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03121
  • Case Name: Jones v. De La Rosa et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.