U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNeill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 08, 2022: [Dismiss ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.