U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01345-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trevino
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • July 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Document]
  • April 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.