U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01344-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bigelow
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.