U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03124
  • Case Name: Chappell v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice-other]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 11, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.