U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.