U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lane
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • May 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Correction]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 07, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.