U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huerta-Esquivel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 07, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.