U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ganter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 02, 2022: [Expedite ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Motion Referred]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 07, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.