U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [SEALED Response to USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 17, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 18, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 07, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.