U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02067
  • Case Name: Hinton v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Document]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 20, 2022: [Document]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.