U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02068
  • Case Name: Bryant v. NC DPS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 16, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response]
  • July 07, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.